DataQuill Limited v. High Tech Computer Corp.

Plaintiff: DataQuill Limited
Defendant: High Tech Computer Corp.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00543
Filed: March 25, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part High Tech Computer Corp's 205 Motion to Exclude the Amended Opinions and Testimony of Mr. Gemini. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/16/2012. (jah)
December 1, 2011 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Joseph Gemini Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702; denying 130 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion for Partia l Summary Judgment. Court excludes Mr. Gemini's testimony to the extent he relies on the "significant patent agreements" in determing the reasonable royalty that would have been reached at the hypothetical negotiation and denies the remaining portions of Dft's motion to exclude. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/1/2011. (jah)
May 14, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant High Tech Computer Corp's 21 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Patent Reexamination. Status Conference set for 8/31/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Parties should submit a status report on the reexamination process by 8/17/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/14/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DataQuill Limited v. High Tech Computer Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DataQuill Limited
Represented By: Gregory S Markow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Tech Computer Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?