Ramirez-Salgado v. Ochoa et al

Petitioner: Jose Ramirez-Salgado
Respondent: Tim Ochoa and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv00562
Filed: March 25, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 19 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is Denied. A Certificate of Appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/10/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (av1).
January 22, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 12 ) is adopted in its entirety. The motion to dismiss the petition (Doc. 8 ) filed by Respondent Larry Scribner is DENIED. Respondents shall file an answer within 30 days of the date of this order. Petitioner shall file his traverse no later than 30 days after the filing of Respondent's answer. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/21/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
April 3, 2008 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice And With Leave To Amend; And (2) Detailing Petitioner's Options: The Court dismisses this case without prejudice and with leave to amend. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he must, no later than 5/5/08, respond to this order by choosing one of the options outlined and by filing a petition which names a proper respondent. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/2/08. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Salgado v. Ochoa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Ramirez-Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?