Clack v. Latimer et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Alexander Clack
Defendant: Latimer and Hoenig
Case Number: 3:2008cv00624
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Latimer's 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute Pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/25/2009. Case closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (kaj).
September 24, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 47 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates. The Pretrial Conference is continued from 10/13/2009 to 12/14/2009. Magistrate Judge Brooks shall is an Amended Scheduling Order incorporating Dfts' requested changes and the new pretrial conference date. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/24/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
August 31, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pla's claims against Deputy Hoening are dismissed for failure to prosecute and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant t o FRCP 4(m), 28 USC 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b). Dft Latimer's motion for summary judgment is granted as to Pla's inadequate medical care claims and denied as to Pla's excessive force claims. Dft County of San Diego's motion for summary judgment is granted.. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/28/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
June 4, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by San Diego County Sheriffs Department, Latimer. Court grants Pla an extension of time pursuant to FRCP 56(f)(2) to supplement his opposition to Dfts' summary judgment w/ any d iscovery he may be entitled, but which is currently subject of his 4/30/2009 Motion. Courts resets Dfts' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment for hearing on 7/27/2009. If Pla's request for discovery is granted, Pla may file a Supplemental Oppos ition to Dfts' Motion by 7/15/2009, If Dfts wish they may file a Supplemental Reply in response by 7/20/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/3/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2009: # 1 Main Document - Corrected) (jah). Modified on 6/4/2009 - Corrected pdf re: year for reply ddl. Pdf added, NEF regenerated (jah). (jrl).
February 18, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying w/o prejudice Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/18/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clack v. Latimer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Alexander Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?