Clack v. Latimer et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher Charles Alexander Clack |
Defendant: |
Latimer and Hoenig |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv00624 |
Filed: |
June 13, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Ruben B. Brooks |
Presiding Judge: |
Irma E. Gonzalez |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 25, 2009 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting Defendant Latimer's 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute Pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/25/2009. Case closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (kaj).
|
September 24, 2009 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting Defendants' 47 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates. The Pretrial Conference is continued from 10/13/2009 to 12/14/2009. Magistrate Judge Brooks shall is an Amended Scheduling Order incorporating Dfts' requested changes and the new pretrial conference date. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/24/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pla's claims against Deputy Hoening are dismissed for failure to prosecute and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant t o FRCP 4(m), 28 USC 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b). Dft Latimer's motion for summary judgment is granted as to Pla's inadequate medical care claims and denied as to Pla's excessive force claims. Dft County of San Diego's motion for summary judgment is granted.. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/28/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
|
June 4, 2009 |
Filing
36
ORDER Continuing Hearing re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by San Diego County Sheriffs Department, Latimer. Court grants Pla an extension of time pursuant to FRCP 56(f)(2) to supplement his opposition to Dfts' summary judgment w/ any d iscovery he may be entitled, but which is currently subject of his 4/30/2009 Motion. Courts resets Dfts' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment for hearing on 7/27/2009. If Pla's request for discovery is granted, Pla may file a Supplemental Oppos ition to Dfts' Motion by 7/15/2009, If Dfts wish they may file a Supplemental Reply in response by 7/20/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/3/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2009: # 1 Main Document - Corrected) (jah). Modified on 6/4/2009 - Corrected pdf re: year for reply ddl. Pdf added, NEF regenerated (jah). (jrl).
|
February 18, 2009 |
Filing
23
ORDER denying w/o prejudice Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/18/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?