McDonald v. Haaws

Petitioner: Joseph Hilton McDonald
Respondent: Haaws
Case Number: 3:2008cv00652
Filed: May 21, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 44 ; (2) Rejecting Petitioner's Objections 50 ; (3) Denying the Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 15 ; and (4) Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/04/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
February 28, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying As Premature (Doc. 46 ) Application For Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner is granted an extension of time in which to file objections to (Doc. 44 ) the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Any objections to the R&R are due by 3/28/2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/28/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
February 8, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Denying 24 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Petition; and Requiring Response: Respondent shall answer the second amended petition within 30 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/8/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (jrl).
June 15, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Motion to Seal Documents ( 11 & 12 ); Denying 16 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem; Setting Briefing Schedule: The Clerk of this Court shall promptly (a) serve a copy of the Second Amended Petition and a copy of this Or der on the Attorney General for the State of California, or his authorized agent; and (b) serve a copy of this Order on Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 6/15/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(2nd Am. Petition and copy of Order sent to Calif. Attorney General via U.S. Mail. Copy of Order sent to Petitioner via U.S. Mail).(mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Haaws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Hilton McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Haaws
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?