Scott v. Chertoff

Plaintiff: James Scott
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Case Number: 3:2008cv00735
Filed: April 23, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 165 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/7/2013. (rlu)(jrd)
September 9, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 158 Motion to Reduce Damages Award. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/9/2013. (rlu)(jrd)
August 30, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 161 Request for Court-Appointed Expert (Trial Brief) filed by James Scott. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/30/2013.(rlu)
September 27, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement. The Court holds that Plaintiff can rescind the August 12, 2010 Memorandum of Settlement based on unilateral mistake. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/27/2012. (sjt)
September 14, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendant's Ex Parte Application To Cancel Or Limit Scope Of Evidentiary Hearing (Re Doc. 96 ): The Court limits the evidentiary hearing to the issue of whether there was a unilateral or mutual mistake as to whether $150,000 was sufficient to provide comparable health coverage to Plaintiff and his family. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/14/2012. (mdc)
July 10, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting an Evidentiary Hearing in Connection with Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement and Denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement. The Court Grants an evidentiary hearing on the issue of whether Plaintiff can a void enforcement of the Memorandum of Settlement based on unilateral or mutual mistake of fact. The Court sets the evidentiary hearing for 9/18/2012 at 2:00 p.m. The Court Denies Plaintiff's motion to enforce settlement. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/10/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)(jrd)
July 11, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference will be held in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on July 28, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., Room 1145. Counsel shall submit settlement statements directly to Magistrate Judge Adler&# 039;s chambers no later than July 21, 2011. All named parties, all counsel, and any other person(s) whose authority is required to negotiate and enter into settlement shall appear in person at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 7/11/11.(ecs)
May 3, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court grants summary judgment in favor Dft on Pla's claims for disability discrimination under the Rehabilitation Act/ADA, retaliation under Title VII, and violation of the ADEA. Court grants summary judgment in favor of Pla on Pla's claim for violation of the Rehabilitation Act/ADA based on disability-related inquiries. Pla's and Dft's motions are denied as to Pla's claim for retaliation under the Rehabilitation Act/ADA. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/3/2010. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Scott
Represented By: Matthew Gene English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?