AT&T Corp. v. Washington Inventory Service

Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Defendant: Washington Inventory Service
Case Number: 3:2008cv00758
Filed: April 28, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 joint Motion for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/6/2010. (tkl)(kaj).
September 16, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 WIS's Motion for Summary Judgment and, alternatively, for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/16/09. (tkl)(jrl).
February 18, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 joint Motion to amend scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/18/09. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corp. v. Washington Inventory Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Andrew A Smits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Inventory Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?