Tuma v. Eaton Corporation

Plaintiff: William J. Tuma
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv00792
Filed: April 30, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendant EATON CORPORATION and against Plaintiff WILLIAM TUMA. Each party shall bear its own costs incurred to date. No award of attorneys' fees is made at this time. (ecs)
November 14, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's claims for commissions arising from the field test order are dismissed with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs incurred in this action to date. (ecs)
September 27, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER re 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is Denied. After a de novo review, the Court Reaffirms its summary judgment order with the modification of some of the supporting reasoning, as set forth above. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/27/11.(ecs)
July 25, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is Denied. After a de novo review, the Court Reaffirms its summary judgment order with the modification of some of the supporting reasoning. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/25/11. (ecs)
May 23, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/23/2011. (jer)
September 20, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Mandatory Settlement Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Settlement Conference in your case will be held on December 10, 2010, at 2:00 P.M. before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom F. Personal appearances are necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/20/2010.(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuma v. Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Tuma
Represented By: Joann F Rezzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Robert A Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?