Weltman v. Ortho Mattress, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Leo Weltman
Defendant: Ortho Mattress, Inc. and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2008cv00840
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion to voluntarily Dismiss Federal Action. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/8/2010. (tkl) (av1).
December 10, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining 40 to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and denying 52 Motion for class certification as moot. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).
August 28, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Amended ex parte application to file a response to defendant's sur-reply by 9/1/09. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/28/09. (tkl)(jrl).
August 14, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 ex parte application to file sur-reply by 8/26/09. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/14/09. (tkl)(jrl).
August 6, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Consolidate without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/6/09. (tkl) (jrl).
June 15, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER 25 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 6/15/09. (tkl) (jrl).
March 9, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 joint Motion for class certification briefing schedule. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by June 26, 2009; Defendant's Opposition by July 24, 2009; Plaintiff's Reply by August 7, 2009; and, The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification set for 8/14/09 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 16. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/9/09. (tkl)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weltman v. Ortho Mattress, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Weltman
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho Mattress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?