Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: German Lee Carter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv00895
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court adopts the conclusions, findings, and recommendations contained in the Report and Recommendation as modified herein. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied 9 and Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted 10 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/31/09. (tkl) (av1).
July 30, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as modified. The court adopts the conclusions, findings, and recommendations contained in the Report and Recommendation as modified herein. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied 9 and Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted 10 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/30/09. (tkl) (av1).
July 8, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER 15 . CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Court adopts the conclusions, findings, and recommendations contained in the Report and Recommendation as modified. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 9 is denied and Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted 10 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) Modified text on 7/8/2009 (tkl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2009: # 1 MAIN DOCUMENT) (tkl).
July 7, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER 15 . ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AS MODIFIED. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied 9 and Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted 10 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/7/09. Modified text on 7/8/2009 (tkl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2009: # 1 Main Document) (tkl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Lee Carter
Represented By: Mary Adele Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?