Southern California Gas Company v. Syntellect, Inc.

Plaintiff: Southern California Gas Company
Defendant: Syntellect, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00941
Filed: May 28, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 172 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/28/2014. (knb)
July 25, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Syntellect's 82 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/25/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
March 28, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1. Granting Southern California Gas Company's 49 Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication; 2. Denying Syntellect's 52 Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; 3. Granting 71 Motion for Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/28/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern California Gas Company v. Syntellect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Gas Company
Represented By: Jason Haruo Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syntellect, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?