Gough-Adshima v. Schwarnegger et al

Plaintiff: Jeff S Gough-Adshima
Defendant: Arnold Schwarnegger, Robert Tillman, Robert Hernandez, J F Salazar, K Fleming, Keith Baker, Antonio Vegas Rodriguez, Greg Sewell, I Brizuela, D Gonzalez and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv00992
Filed: May 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Vacate Judgment. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
July 13, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Pla's First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failing to state a claim upon a claim which relief may be granted, as frivolou s and for monetary damages against immune defendants pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B). Court finds amendment of Pla's 1983 claims would be futile at this time, leave to amend is denied. Case is closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
July 10, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failing to state a upon which relief may be granted, as frivolous and for seeking monetary damages against immune defendants pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B). Because Court finds amendment to Pla's 1983 claims would be futile at this time, leave to amend is denied. Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/9/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
June 29, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Second Motion to Reopen Case and File First Amended Complaint. Clerk directed to file First Amended Complaint, which is attached to Pla's Motion 8 , as a separate entry. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/29/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
March 30, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Vacate, 5 Motion to Set Aside, and 5 Motion to Reopen Case. Clerk directed to reopen the case. Pla is granted 45 days leave from the which cures the deficiencies of pleading noted in Court's 7/3/ 2008 Order. Pla's Amended Complaint must be complete and w/o reference to original Complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/30/2009. Case reopened. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl). Modified on 6/2/2009 - Corrected spelling (jah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gough-Adshima v. Schwarnegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff S Gough-Adshima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarnegger
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tillman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J F Salazar
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Fleming
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Baker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Vegas Rodriguez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sewell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Brizuela
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Gonzalez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?