Traylor Bros., Inc. v. San Diego Unified Port District

Plaintiff: Traylor Bros., Inc.
Defendant: San Diego Unified Port District
Case Number: 3:2008cv01019
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 110 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; Terminating as moot 115 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/26/2012. (mtb)
February 16, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Protective Order. On January 13, 2011, the Court held a Case Management Conference. On or before March 2, 2011, counsel shall file with the Court the Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/16/2011. (srm)
June 25, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Documents and Related Protective Order and Order to Show Cause: The Port is HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why its motion to disqualify should not be barred by waiver. If the Port intends to proceed wi th its motion to disqualify, it must no later than 7/6/2009 file and serve a memorandum of points and authorities no more than seven pages in length and supporting evidence, if any, to show cause why its motion to disqualify should not be barred by w aiver. No later than July 13, 2009, Traylor's opposition, no more than seven pages in length and supporting evidence, if any, due 7/13/2009. The Port's, no more than five pages in length, and supporting evidence, if any due 7/16/2009. If the Port is successful in showing its motion to disqualify is not barred, the court will issue a briefing schedule to consider the merits of the motion and any related motion to seal exhibits. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/25/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
May 4, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Strike Seventh Affirmative Defense. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/4/2009. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor Bros., Inc. v. San Diego Unified Port District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traylor Bros., Inc.
Represented By: Robert P Allenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified Port District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?