Sanford v. DOE et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lionel Sanford
Defendant: DOE, L. E. Scribner, Levin, S Thomas, R Sowtell, Debra Dexter, D Holbrook and L Bonnett
Case Number: 3:2008cv01049
Filed: August 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Declining to Vacate Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has not shown grounds for reconsideration of the Order granting summary judgment. Accordingly, the Court declines to vacate its order. Moreover, the Court need not file a certificate of appealab ility in a section 1983 case, and denies the 114 request on that ground. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/27/2010. (USCA Case No. 10-56160. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
July 15, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendants Motion to Dismiss Defendant Cate, and denies Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Levin. All remaining parties to this case will file their Answer to the Amended Complaint by 08/14/2009. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag) (jrl).
June 22, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 Report and Recommendations. The Court GRANTS Defendants 20 days to file a responsive pleading regarding the sufficiency of the factual allegations against Defendant Levin in Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and the sufficiency of allegations against Defendant Cate by 7/13/2009. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/19/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag) (jrl).
February 11, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Name on Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2009 and Replies due by 3/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 2/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanford v. DOE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lionel Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. E. Scribner
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levin
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Thomas
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Sowtell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Dexter
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Holbrook
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Bonnett
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?