Gray v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Lee Gray
Defendant: John Doe, Robert Hernandez, ., E Marrero, K Sterling and A R Peterson
Case Number: 3:2008cv01147
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lassen
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2012 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/18/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
April 12, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 118 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/12/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
March 22, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's § 1983 claims for violation of his Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment rights, his claims for injunctive relief, his claims against Defend ant Hernandez, and his claims against Defendants in their official capacities.Plaintiff's claims under the Eighth and Fourteenth Amendments and for injunctive relief are dismissed without prejudice. His claims against Defendant Hernandez and aga inst the remaining defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complaint consistent with this order. If Plaintiff wishes to file a second amended complaint, he must do so by April 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/14/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (cap).
March 23, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 72 leave to file first amended complaint no later than April 16,2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
December 10, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying case 52 . The court hereby STAYS the case pending resolution of Plaintiff's interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
August 27, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's § 1983 claims for violation of his Eighth and Fourteenth Amendments, his claims against Defendant Hernandez, and his claims for injunctive relief are dismissed without prejudice and wit h leave to amend. Plaintiff's claims for damages against Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a first amended complaint consistent with this order by 9/28/09. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/27/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
July 31, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/31/09. Plaintiff's current request for a correction is moot and the motion is therefore denied. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hernandez, .
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Sterling
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A R Peterson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?