Hartford Life Insurance Company v. Banks et al

Plaintiff: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary Banks, Beryl Rayford, Umar Almajid, North American Mercantile, Inc., Sandberg, Phoenix and Von Gontard, P.C., Monnye Gross and Richard Wyer
Case Number: 3:2008cv01279
Filed: July 16, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1335 Interpleader Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Distribute Funds And To Close Interest Bearing Account: The (Doc. 124 ) Joint Response to this Court's Order filed by Defendants Mary Banks, Beryl Rayford, and Sanberg Phoenix & Von Gontard P.C. is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall issue final judgment and distribute the interpleaded funds as follows: $52,236.70 to Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard P.C.; $9,475.90 to Beryl Rayford; $3,353.00 to Mary Banks; and the Clerk is authorized to deduct ten percent of the ea rned interest, as authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States, and to the extent any funds remain at the time the Court enters its order for distribution, such funds shall be distributed to Beryl Rayford. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/15/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
June 21, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 126 ) Motion to Enter Default Judgment against Cross-Defendant North American Mercantile, Inc. in the amount of $56,236.70 filed by Defendant and Cross-Plaintiff Sanberg Phoenix and Von Gontard P.C. is granted. The Joint Respon se to this Court's Order filed by Defendants Mary Banks, Beyrl Rayford, and Sanberg Phoenix and Von Gontard P.C. (Doc. 124 ) remains pending. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Umar Almajid and North American Mercantile, Inc. as notice of the terms of the proposed settlement. Any party may file a response or opposition to the proposed settlement by no later than 7/22/2011. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, copies of this Order also were mailed to Umar Almajid and North American Mercantile, Inc.) (mdc)(jrd)
April 11, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the 65 Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment is vacated. Sandberg may file a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2) no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff must obtain a hearing date pursuant to the Local Rules of Civil Procedure before filing any motion. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to North American Mercantile, Inc. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/11/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: North American Mercantile, Inc.)(lmt)(jrd)
October 8, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Sandberg, Phoenix & von Gontard, P.C.'s (Doc. 106 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Hartford is ordered to liquidate Annuity 1 and deposited with the Court within 14 days of the date of this order. Sandberg, Phoenix & von Gontard , P.C., Beryl Rayford, and Mary Banks may file further briefing on or before 11/1/2010 as to distribution of the share of the annuity proceeds which the settlement agreement awarded to defaulted defendant NAM. Umar Alamjid's (Doc. 108 ) Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Cross-Complaint Against Sandberg or Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Cross Complaint is denied. Almajid's Cross Claims against Banks and Rayford are dismissed without prejudice and without leave to amend. The Court vacates the scheduling order (Doc. 116 ) issued on 7/29/2010. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
January 26, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Sandberg's Motion to Dismiss Cross-Complaint; Denying 56 Almajid's Motion to Drop Defendant; Denying 69 Banks, Rayford, and Sandberg's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Denying 70 Sandberg's Ex Parte Motion to set Status Conference. Sandberg's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates 77 was previously granted 79 . A scheduling order issued concurrently with this order sets new pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
March 25, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims of Counter-Claimant Umar Abd Almajaid and North American Mercantile, Inc. (Doc. 31 ) is granted. The claims for (1) civil RICO substance and conspiracy; (2) conspiracy; (3) interference with contractual rel ationship; (4) fraudulent concealment; and (5) accounting alleged in the "Answer-Complaint in Interpleader Counterclaim for Damages" filed by North American Mercantile, Inc. and Umar Abd Almajid (Doc. 21 ) are dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/25/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Life Insurance Company v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beryl Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umar Almajid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Mercantile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandberg, Phoenix and Von Gontard, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monnye Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?