Hartford Life Insurance Company v. Banks et al
Plaintiff: |
Hartford Life Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Mary Banks, Beryl Rayford, Umar Almajid, North American Mercantile, Inc., Sandberg, Phoenix and Von Gontard, P.C., Monnye Gross and Richard Wyer |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv01279 |
Filed: |
July 16, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
Insurance Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
William Q. Hayes |
Presiding Judge: |
Leo S. Papas |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 15, 2011 |
Filing
130
ORDER To Distribute Funds And To Close Interest Bearing Account: The (Doc. 124 ) Joint Response to this Court's Order filed by Defendants Mary Banks, Beryl Rayford, and Sanberg Phoenix & Von Gontard P.C. is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall issue final judgment and distribute the interpleaded funds as follows: $52,236.70 to Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard P.C.; $9,475.90 to Beryl Rayford; $3,353.00 to Mary Banks; and the Clerk is authorized to deduct ten percent of the ea rned interest, as authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States, and to the extent any funds remain at the time the Court enters its order for distribution, such funds shall be distributed to Beryl Rayford. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/15/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
129
ORDER: The (Doc. 126 ) Motion to Enter Default Judgment against Cross-Defendant North American Mercantile, Inc. in the amount of $56,236.70 filed by Defendant and Cross-Plaintiff Sanberg Phoenix and Von Gontard P.C. is granted. The Joint Respon se to this Court's Order filed by Defendants Mary Banks, Beyrl Rayford, and Sanberg Phoenix and Von Gontard P.C. (Doc. 124 ) remains pending. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Umar Almajid and North American Mercantile, Inc. as notice of the terms of the proposed settlement. Any party may file a response or opposition to the proposed settlement by no later than 7/22/2011. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, copies of this Order also were mailed to Umar Almajid and North American Mercantile, Inc.) (mdc)(jrd)
|
April 11, 2011 |
Filing
125
ORDER: the 65 Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment is vacated. Sandberg may file a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2) no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff must obtain a hearing date pursuant to the Local Rules of Civil Procedure before filing any motion. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to North American Mercantile, Inc. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/11/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: North American Mercantile, Inc.)(lmt)(jrd)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
121
ORDER: Sandberg, Phoenix & von Gontard, P.C.'s (Doc. 106 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Hartford is ordered to liquidate Annuity 1 and deposited with the Court within 14 days of the date of this order. Sandberg, Phoenix & von Gontard , P.C., Beryl Rayford, and Mary Banks may file further briefing on or before 11/1/2010 as to distribution of the share of the annuity proceeds which the settlement agreement awarded to defaulted defendant NAM. Umar Alamjid's (Doc. 108 ) Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Cross-Complaint Against Sandberg or Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Cross Complaint is denied. Almajid's Cross Claims against Banks and Rayford are dismissed without prejudice and without leave to amend. The Court vacates the scheduling order (Doc. 116 ) issued on 7/29/2010. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
86
ORDER granting 54 Sandberg's Motion to Dismiss Cross-Complaint; Denying 56 Almajid's Motion to Drop Defendant; Denying 69 Banks, Rayford, and Sandberg's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Denying 70 Sandberg's Ex Parte Motion to set Status Conference. Sandberg's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates 77 was previously granted 79 . A scheduling order issued concurrently with this order sets new pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing
39
ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims of Counter-Claimant Umar Abd Almajaid and North American Mercantile, Inc. (Doc. 31 ) is granted. The claims for (1) civil RICO substance and conspiracy; (2) conspiracy; (3) interference with contractual rel ationship; (4) fraudulent concealment; and (5) accounting alleged in the "Answer-Complaint in Interpleader Counterclaim for Damages" filed by North American Mercantile, Inc. and Umar Abd Almajid (Doc. 21 ) are dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/25/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?