Nimtz v. Cepin, M.D. et al

Plaintiff: Frederick B. Nimtz
Defendant: Daniel Cepin, M.D., Guidant Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01294
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE and Remanding to State Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/25/2011. (Certified copy sent to Superior Court of California, County of San Diego) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
June 1, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 with prejudice defendant Guidant Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the first amended complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/1/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
March 3, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Without Prejudice (Doc. 18 ) Defendant Guidant LLC's Motion to Dismiss; Denying (Doc. 18 ) Motion to Strike Failure to Warn; Granting Leave To Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff is Granted until April 11, 2011 in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/3/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nimtz v. Cepin, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick B. Nimtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cepin, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidant Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?