Burnett v. Dugan et al

Plaintiff: Ester Burnett
Defendant: Dugan, Kinji L Hawthorne, John Doe #1 and Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv01324
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting (Doc. 123 ) Supplemental Report and Recommendation; Overruling Plaintiff's Objections; Denying (Doc. 89 ) Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint; and Denying Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm) (av1).
March 8, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Premature and Without Prejudice (Doc. 109 ) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion For Request of Waiver of Service. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/8/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
September 30, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in part 102 Report and Recommendations; Granting 87 Motion to Dismiss Unexhausted Claim; Granting 88 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Referring 89 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint to Magistrate Judge ; Denying 113 Motion for Leave to File Late Response to Motion to Dismiss: IT IS ORDERED: ADOPTING in part the Report and Recommendation with respect to defendants motion to dismiss the SAC for failure to exhaust and motion to dismiss for failure t o state a claim; OVERRULING plaintiffs objections to the report and recommendation in theirentirety; GRANTING defendants motion to dismiss unexhausted claim without prejudice; GRANTING defendants motion to dismiss the SAC with prejudice as to Warden Almager, Dr. Barreras, Dr. Dugan and Dr. Hawthorne, and without prejudice as to defendants Dr. Fraze, Dr. Khatri, G.J. Guirbino and Jane Doe, R.N.; DENYING plaintiffs motion for leave to file a late answer to defendants motion to dismiss the SAC; and REFERRING plaintiffs motion for leave to file a supplemental complaint to the magistrate judge for further consideration. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/30/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
August 23, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60: Plaintiffs Motion for Relief from the Courts October 9, 2009 Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
July 6, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/6/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
March 18, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 91 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Plaintiffs Motion for an Emergency Preliminary Injunction is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/18/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (jrl).
November 16, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 79 Motion for Court to Reconsider Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/16/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (jrl).
September 8, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 65. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/8/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
July 29, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Denying 41 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/29/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
May 6, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Motion for PReliminary Injunction: The Court hereby ORDERS Defendants to comply with the Medical Directions issued by Samuel Ko, M.D. on January 21, 2009 directing Plaintiff to be issued a single bed in a single cell without any o verhead bunk or any overhead obstruction due to Plaintiffs medical condition. The Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order upon Domingo Uribe, Jr., Acting Warden, California State Prison, Centinela. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(copy sent via mail to Acting Warden Uribe).(mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett v. Dugan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinji L Hawthorne
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?