Pinnacle Fitness and Recreation Management, LLC v. The Jerry and Vickie Moyes Family Trust et al

Plaintiff: Pinnacle Fitness and Recreation Management, LLC
Defendant: The Jerry and Vickie Moyes Family Trust, Deer Valley Capital, LLC and Carefree Capital Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv01368
Filed: July 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 357 The Trust's Motion to Amend The Second Amended Judgment. The hearing set for November 1, 2013, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
July 17, 2013 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 322 Pinnacle's Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses; (2) Denying 335 the Trust's Motion to Retax Costs. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
June 27, 2013 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying In Part and Granting In Part 341 The Trust's Motion To Correct And Amend The Amended Judgment. The hearing on the Trust's Motion, currently set for June 28, 2013, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)(jrd)
May 15, 2013 340 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT FOLLOWING CIVIL JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/15/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 8, 2013 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 309 Trust's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; (2) Denying as Moot 316 Trust's Motion For Relief Pursuant to Rule 62(b); (3) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 313 Pinnac le's Motion to Correct Judgment. Pinnacle shall lodge a proposed amended judgment via email (efile_curiel@casd.uscourts.gov) by 5/15/2013. The hearing on these motions, currently set for May 10, 2013, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/8/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
March 1, 2012 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 199 Request for Oral Argument on Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/1/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
January 4, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 170 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 171 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 01/04/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
April 21, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion to Amend 107 ; and denying Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment as moot and without prejudice 127 , 128 , 129 , 130 , 131 , 132 , 133 , 134 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, and 142 Ex Parte Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's shall file the FAC on or before April 25, 2011. The parties are ordered to jointly contact Judge Skomal's chambers on or before April 29, 2011 to schedule a Case Management Conference. Given the number of dispositive motions anticipated, the briefing will be set as follows: the motion filing cut-off will be 60 days before the scheduled hearing date, responses will be due 40 days prior to the hearing date and replies will be due 30 days before the hearing date. The parties must contact the clerk prior to the motion filing cut-off to obtain a hearing date. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 04/21/11. (cge)
April 18, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court grants in part defendant's ex parte motion. The deposition of third-party witness Alan Waskin may take place on or before May 4, 201 1. All other dates and deadlines remain as set and will not be modified absent good cause. Additionally, the Court denies without prejudice Defendants request to supplement any summary judgment briefing with information learned from Alan Waskins deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 04/18/11. (cge) (mam).
December 13, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Third-Party Defendant Marsha Forsythe-Fournier's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/13/10. (lmt)
August 3, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1) Granting (Docs. 47 , 48 ) Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint; 2) Denying (Doc. 56 ) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to File Supplemental Briefing. Defendant shall cause the third-party complaint to be filed on or before August 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/3/2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Fitness and Recreation Management, LLC v. The Jerry and Vickie Moyes Family Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Fitness and Recreation Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael L Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jerry and Vickie Moyes Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deer Valley Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carefree Capital Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?