Tourgeman v. Collins Financial Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Tourgeman
Defendant: Collins Financial Services, Inc., Nelson & Kennard, Dell Financial Services, L.P., DFS Acceptance, DFS Production, American Investment Bank, N.A. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01392
Filed: July 31, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Class Claim. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/15/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
April 17, 2012 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 259 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for class certification, and Denying 234 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration.Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/17/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
January 5, 2012 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion for Sanctions: Plaintiff's request for facts supporting numerosity to be taken as established is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for sanctions in the form of attorney's fees and costs is partially GRANTED. Defendants SHALL PAY fees to Plaintiff's counsel at the rate of $450 per hour for 6.8 hours of courthouse research, 7.8 hours of preparation for the Reply brief, and the hours spent on preparing the motion for sancti ons to be provided by Plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiff's counsel SHALL FILE a declaration with the Court outlining the number of hours he spent preparing the motion for sanctions no later than 1/20/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/5/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
October 21, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 183 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/21/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
July 26, 2011 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' Motions to Dismiss 165 166 ; Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted as to the following claims, which are dismissed with prejudice: (1) Plaintiff's claims under 15 U.S.C.  67;§ 1692b and 1692g; (2) Plaintiff's claim that Collins violated the FDCPA and Rosenthal Act by failing to be meaningfully involved in the collection of debts; (3) Plaintiff's claims against Nelson & Kennard for violation of Californi a Business and Professions Code section 17200 and negligence, to the extent that they are based on Nelson & Kennard's filing of the state court complaint; and (4) Plaintiff's invasion of privacy claim. As to their remainder, Defendants' motions are denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/26/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
November 22, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 141 Ex Parte Motion to Strike Erin Towns's Deposition Testimony and (2) granting 125 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint: the scheduling order is modified accordingly: Plaintiff shall file his third amended co mplaint within 7 days of the date that this Order is electronically docketed. Within 7 days of the date Plaintiff files his amended complaint, the parties shall submit to Judge Stormes a joint motion to extend the pretrial dates to accommodate a limited reopening of discovery to investigate Plaintiff's new allegations. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/22/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
October 18, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 121 Objection filed by Collins Financial Services, Inc., Nelson & Kennard: the Court refers this matter to Judge Stormes so that she can award attorneys' fees incurred in connection with Plaintiff's response. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/18/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 26, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 106 Motion for Attorney Fees and 119 Motion to Supplement: Court, in its discretion, finds it appropriate to award Tourgeman $13,278.00 of all the attorney's fees requeste. Accordingly, no later than 9/1010, Defendants s hall tender full payment of a total of $13,278.00 to Plaintiff's counsel in attorney's fees associated with the Motion to Compel and the filing of Objections. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of additional sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 3, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Defendants' 107 108 Objections: Given that Defendants' objections are without merit, they are overruled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/3/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; notice sent regarding mandatory ECF registration)(lmt)
November 23, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 81 Rule 56(f) Motion, and Denying Defendants' 71 , 76 Motions for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) motion is denied to the extent it seeks a continuance of summary jud gment on whether he paid his debt in full. It is, however, granted in part as to the remainder of Defendants' motions for summary judgment. Defendants' motions for summary judgment are denied with prejudice in part as to question of whether Plaintiff paid his debt in full. Those motions are denied without prejudice in part as to their remainder. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/23/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tourgeman v. Collins Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tourgeman
Represented By: Daniel Peter Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson & Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Financial Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFS Acceptance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFS Production
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Investment Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?