Fractional Villas, Inc. v. Tahoe Clubhouse et al

Plaintiff: Fractional Villas, Inc.
Defendant: Tahoe Clubhouse, Got It! Real Estate and Development Corp. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01396
Filed: July 31, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Stipulated Settlement Agreement, Mutual Release of Claims and Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. Court approves the Agreement. Magistrate Judge Porter shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement memorialized in the Stipulated Settlement Agreement. Dismissal w/ prejudice is conditional upon parties' full compliance w/ the terms of the Stipulated Settlement Agreement. Dismissal w/ prejudice will be filed by Pla w/in 5 days of the final payment. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/26/2009. (jah)(av1).
May 8, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with prejudice Defendants' 31 Motion to Dismiss Count Two of Pla's Second Amended Complaint, because amendment would be futile. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/8/2009. (jah). Modified on 5/11/2009 - Edited text (jah).
February 25, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant WebResult's 18 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3). All claims against WebResults are dismissed. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/25/2009. (jah) (jrl).
January 22, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dft Tahoe Clubhouse, Got It! Real Estate, Rene Brejc, and Del LaFountain's 15 Motion to Dismiss. Dfts' Motion for a More Definite Statement is denied. Pla may file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies w/in 20 days of the file stamped date of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/22/2009. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fractional Villas, Inc. v. Tahoe Clubhouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fractional Villas, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Lee Sirota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahoe Clubhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Got It! Real Estate and Development Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?