Guatay Christian Fellowship v. County of San Diego

Plaintiff: Guatay Christian Fellowship
Defendant: County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2008cv01406
Filed: August 4, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 withdrawal of counsel. Attorney Peter Lepiscopo will remain lead counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/13/09. (tkl) (av1).
July 10, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Depositions of Walter Ekard and Chandra Wallar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).
May 22, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing on pla's motion for summary judgment and to set hearing date for cross-motions for summary judgment 52 . The County of San Diego will file its motion for summary judgment by July 10, 2009. The hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment will be held on August 13, 2009 at 3:30 p.m.; oppositions by July 30, 2009; replies by August 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/22/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guatay Christian Fellowship v. County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guatay Christian Fellowship
Represented By: Peter Dominick Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?