Tomovich v. Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.

Plaintiff: Catharine J. Tomovich
Defendant: Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01428
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of Court shall close thefile. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/22/09. (tkl)
August 7, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and expenses and setting Settlement Disposition Conference. The Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on September 22, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/7/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 17, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Compel; 20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/17/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 24, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 joint Motion to Continue mandatory settlement conference and pla's motions to compel to 4/6/2009 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/24/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomovich v. Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catharine J. Tomovich
Represented By: Shaun Khojayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?