Gomez et al v. Millan-Martinez et al

Plaintiff: Enedino Duran Gomez, Gerardo Duran Tovar, Reynaldo Galvan, Oscar Garcia-Tovar, Zacarias Gutierrez Milla, Alvaro Juan Jimenez, Antonio Jimenez, Andres Millan, Juan Millan-Martinez, Benito Rojas, Rafael Velazquez and a Class of similarly-situated employees and participants
Defendant: Rossi Concrete, Inc., Joseph James Rossi and Rossi Concrete, Inc. Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Case Number: 3:2008cv01442
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion to Modify Class and denying 117 Motion to Decertify Class. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/31/12. (cge)
February 17, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 105 Application to Take Summary Judgment Motion Off Calendar. The Court grants Defendants' application and denies Plaintiffs' 92 Motion for Summary Judgment as to liability on class issues without prejudice. Plaintiffs may re -file their motion as soon as the two pending motions regarding class certification are decided, notice has been given, and the period for class members to exclude themselves has expired. Plaintiffs request for the Court to order the notice procedure to begin immediately is denied. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/16/11. (jer)
September 22, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 35 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/22/2010. (jer)
July 6, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Request that Defendants Lodge Deposition Transcripts. Denying 68 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/6/10. (vet)
July 1, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Sur-Reply. The Court grants Defendants leave to file a sur-reply. Brief must be filed by July 16, 2010. Grants 72 motion to strike or leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/1/10. (vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez et al v. Millan-Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enedino Duran Gomez
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Duran Tovar
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Galvan
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Garcia-Tovar
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zacarias Gutierrez Milla
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Juan Jimenez
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Jimenez
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Millan
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Millan-Martinez
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Rojas
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Velazquez
Represented By: Natalia Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: a Class of similarly-situated employees and participants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph James Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi Concrete, Inc. Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?