Lested v. Alaris Medical Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Debra Lested
Defendant: Alaris Medical Systems, Inc., Life Insurance Company of North America and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01495
Filed: August 15, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Lested's motion for attorney's fees, prejudgment interest, and costs. Attorney's fees are awarded in the amount of $41,580. Prejudgment interest is awarded at a rate of 5% per annum. Costs are awarded in the amount of $350. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/8/2010. (tkl)
September 11, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Joint MOTION to Continue bench Trial to 1/19/2010 at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom 16. The court held a telephonic status conference on September 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/11/09. (tkl) (jrl).
August 11, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 joint Motion for a waiver of pre-trial requirements under Civil Local Rules 16.1(f)(4) and (f)(6). The court held a telephonic status conference on August 7, 2009. The court sets the following briefing schedule: 1) Memorandum o f Contentions of Fact and Law due by 8/21/2009; 2) each party shall file and serve an Opening Trial Brief by 9/11/09 and 3) each party shall file and serve any Responsive Trial Brief by 9/18/09. Bench Trial set for 9/21/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/10/09. Modified text on 8/11/2009 (tkl). (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lested v. Alaris Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lested
Represented By: Charles J Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaris Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?