Karoun Dairies, Inc. v. Karoun Dairies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Karoun Dairies, Inc.
Defendant: Karlacti, Inc., Ara Baghdassarian and Karoun Dairies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01521
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2014 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 335 Motion for Order to De-Designate Documents for use in Foreign Proceedings. Defendants shall de-designate documents by October 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/14/14. (cge)
July 8, 2014 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants/Counterclaimants' 314 Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety. The Court finds the stay no longer necessary and herewithvacates the stay. Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/8/14. (cge)
September 3, 2013 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 261 Motion to Stay Trial Proceedings pending Decision by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal in related case and requiring the parties to submit a joint status report in 60 days. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/3/13. (cge)
January 4, 2013 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 226 Motion for Reconsideration and, alternatively, Request for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/4/13. (cge)
December 7, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 68 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the order denying its motion to dismiss the counterclaim is Denied. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/6/2010. (srm)
September 13, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/13/2010. (mjj)
July 13, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction: Based on Plaintiffs pleadings and affidavits, and resolving any conflicts between affidavits in Plaintiffs favor, Plaintiff made a prima facie showing of jurisdictional facts as to all Defendants and causes of action. See Dole, 303 F.3d at 1108. Defendants motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is therefore DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/13/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karoun Dairies, Inc. v. Karoun Dairies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karoun Dairies, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Ann Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karlacti, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ara Baghdassarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karoun Dairies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?