Steinmetz v. General Electric Company et al

Plaintiff: S. D. Steinmetz
Defendant: General Electric Company and General Electric Capital Corporation, .
Case Number: 3:2008cv01635
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court hereby grants Defendant ExxonMobil's motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file.(tkl) (kaj).
October 22, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 67 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/22/09. (tkl) (jrl).
August 6, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel James O'Rielly for Exxon Mobil Corporation, General Electric Company and General Electric Capital Corporation. Attorney Ronald R Giusso terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/6/09. (tkl) (jrl).
July 13, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Citibank's Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisises Plaintiff's claims against Citibank under the FCRA, the CCRAA, and for defamation without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file and serve a Third Amended Complaint no later than 30 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/13/09. (tkl) (av1).
January 7, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting plaintiff and cross-defendant Citibank (South Dakota), N.A., to appear telephonically at ENE Conference 27 28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/7/09. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinmetz v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. D. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Ronald R Giusso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Capital Corporation, .
Represented By: Ronald R Giusso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?