Backe v. Novatel Wireless, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Maureen Backe
Defendant: Novatel Wireless, Inc., George Weinert, Dan Halvorson, Peter Leparulo, Kenneth Leddon and Shawn Swaney
Case Number: 3:2008cv01689
Filed: September 15, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2014 528 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 525 Motion to Amend the Judgement Date. The judgment in this action is deemed entered on June 20, 2014. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/8/14. (cge)
June 23, 2014 521 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 514 Motion to Intervene such that Movant may make his Objections on the record, the Court ultimately overrules the Objections. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/23/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
November 14, 2013 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 489 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/13/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
February 7, 2013 458 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Defendants' 453 Motion for Reconsideration re 450 Order on Motion to Exclude; (2) Vacating the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steinholt; (3) Granting Defendants' 299 Mo tion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Steinholt; and (4) Granting Plaintiffs the Opportunity to Cure Steinholt's Expert Testimony. Pretrial Conference set for March 8, 2013 is vacated and reset for 8/22/2013 at 2:00PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Jury trial scheduled for 6/3/13 is vacated and will be reset at the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/7/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
November 8, 2012 449 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 293 Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of M. Todd Henderson. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/8/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
June 27, 2012 444 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 436 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/27/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
March 1, 2012 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 398 Motion to Exclude Defendants' Loss Causation Expert Dr. Bradford Cornell. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/1/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
November 23, 2011 414 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 289 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 290 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/23/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
November 17, 2011 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of D. Paul Regan and Anthony Lendez 397 , 298 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/17/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
April 14, 2011 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 364 Motion to File Certain Portions of the Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Third-Party KPMG Documents Designated as Privileged by Defendant Novatel and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Eric I. Niehaus in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 04/14/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
December 8, 2010 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming (Doc. 244 ) Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order. The Court overrules (Doc. 247 ) Plaintiffs' objection to the discovery order and affirms the Magistrate Judge's order without prejudice to a specific showing based on new facts or new law. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backe v. Novatel Wireless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Backe
Represented By: Lionel Z Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novatel Wireless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Weinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Leparulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Leddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Swaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?