U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dillards, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dillards, Inc., Dillard Store Services, Inc. and Does 1-11
Case Number: 3:2008cv01780
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2003 Job Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment and 76 Motion to Preclude EEOC from Recovery on Behalf of Anyone Other Than Corina Scott, Irma Moreno and Allison Mazon. Dilliard's motions for summary jud gment are denied in their entirety. Discovery is re-opened to allow Dillard's an opportunity to conduct depositions of the newly identified claimants. Discovery shall be completed by 5/10/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2012 is continued to 7/16/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Counsel shall contact Magistrate Judge Lewis to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/9/2012. (jah)
September 28, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Dillard's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting EEOC's 59 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Filing and and Hearing Plaintiff's Motion to Deny or Extend Deadlines Re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Dillard's motion for summary judgment is denied w/o prejudice to re-noticing on 1/3/2012 or thereafter. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/28/2011. (jah)
July 14, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Dillard Store Services, Inc. and Dillards, Inc's 32 Motion to Preclude EEOC Claims on Behalf of Persons Other Than Corina Scott. Dfts' motion to preclude all claims other than those as serted by the EEOC on behalf of Corina Scott is denied. Dfts' motion to preclude claims asserted by the EEOC on behalf of individuals other than current and former employees of Dfts' store in El Centro, CA is granted. Dfts' motion to b ar the EEOC's claims on behalf of Brittany Rios Kim as untimely is granted. These claims are dismissed w/o prejudice. If the EEOC chooses to amend its claims on Rios Kim's behalf, it shall do do w/in 21 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/14/2011. (jah)
August 25, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER denying 15 Joint MOTION to Stay. Court does not find good cause to stay case until 1/15/2010 and denies the joint motion. Dft may have one final extension of time to respond to the Complaint, Answer due 9/18/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/24/2009. (jah) (av1).
August 18, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Joint Motion to Stay. Court does not find good cause to stay case until 1/15/2010. Dft may have one final extension to respond to the Complaint. Answer due by 9/18/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/18/2009. (jah)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dillards, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard Store Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?