Johnson v. Wennes et al

Defendant: Timothy Wennes, Sheila Zuckerman, Countrywide Bank, Countrywide Home Loans, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Bank of America
Petitioner: Warren Brad Johnson
Case Number: 3:2008cv01798
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 29 Motion to Dismiss w/ prejudice. Denying as moot Defendants' motion for a more definite statement. Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/4/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (av1).
April 28, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Leave to File a Sur-Reply: Plaintiffs objection, construed as a motion for reconsideration of the Courts April 20, 2009 Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/28/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
February 26, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 40 Plaintiff's "First Answer to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for More Definite Statement": Plaintiffs first answer to defendants motion to dismiss and for more definite statement and plaintiffs demand for res ponse to complaint by affidavit of truth is STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. Because the time has past for filing a response in opposition to defendants motion to dismiss or for more definite statement, if plaintiff seeks to file an opposition that addresse s defendants motion, he must file with the Clerk of the Court and serve upon opposing counsel an ex parte motion for an extension of time in which to file and serve opposing counsel his response in opposition to the motion to dismiss or for more defi nite statement. The ex parte motion for an extension of time must be received by the Clerk of the Court no later than March 9, 2009. The March 2, 2009 hearing on defendants motion to dismiss is VACATED. Defendants are not required to file a reply memorandum unless ordered to do so by the Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/26/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
January 13, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 33 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment: Plaintiffs motion for default judgment is DENIED. To the extent plaintiffs motion for default judgment is intended to be a request for entry of default, the request is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
January 5, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying With Prejudice 30 Freedom of Information Act Request. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/5/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wennes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Brad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Wennes
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation
Represented By: Aaron M McKown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?