Donald Green v. The State of California Board of Parole Hearing et al

Petitioner: Donald Green
Respondent: The State of California Board of Parole Hearing and Larry Small
Case Number: 3:2008cv01803
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Certificate of Appealability. The Court finds that reasonable jurists would agree that the California conclusions were neither contrary to nor an unreasonable application of clearly established federal law. Accordingly, the Court DENIES certificate of appealability in this case. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/1/2010. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
March 11, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Petitioner's 24 Objections; Adopting 21 Report and Recommendation; Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Denying Request for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/11/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (jcj).
August 14, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2009, Replies due by 9/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald Green v. The State of California Board of Parole Hearing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State of California Board of Parole Hearing
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?