Estate of Alan Kosakoff et al v. City of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Alan Kosakoff, Arlene Kosakoff and Harold Kosakoff
Defendant: City of San Diego, San Diego Police Department, William Landsdowne, Officer Gottfried, Officer Lenahan, Officer Douglas and DOES 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2008cv01819
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court grants Dfts' motion as it relates to Plaintiffs' 1st, 2nd and 3rd causes of action against Officer Gottfried. In all other respect, Court de nies summary judgment. Court orders Plaintiffs to file w/in one week after the filing of this Order, a motion to dismiss w/ respect to their Monell claim and Dfts Lansdowne and San Diego Police Department. If Plaintiffs' fail to file the motion to dismiss, Court will grant as unopposed Dfts' motion for summary judgment in this regard. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/29/2010. (jah)(jrl).
August 31, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Joint Motion to Produce Psychological/Psychiatric Records and granting 30 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/31/2009. (jah) (jrl).
August 24, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All fact discovery shall be completed by 10/9/2009. Deadline for compliance w/ expert disclosures shall be 10/30/2009. Deadline to provide rebuttal expert disclosures shall be 11/20/2009. All expert discovery shall be completed by 1/1/2010. All other pretrial motions must be filed by 2/1/2010. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 6/1/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/14/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. All nonconflicting provision of Court's 3/17/2009 Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/24/2009. (jah)(av1).
June 3, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 20 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/3/2009. (jah) (jrl).
February 4, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/3/2009. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Alan Kosakoff et al v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Alan Kosakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Kosakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Kosakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Landsdowne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lenahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?