Desantiago v. Oh et al

Plaintiff: Edwardo Desantiago
Defendant: Oh and L Marquez
Case Number: 3:2008cv01882
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Dismissal of Defendant Oh for failure to prosecute pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(m) is warranted in this matter. Defendant Dr. Oh is Dismissed without Prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
October 3, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant Oh for Failing to Prosecute Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(m). The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment dismissing Dr. Oh without prejudice and shall close the file. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/3/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
July 21, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 35 Defendant Marquez's Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 56(c) and Issuing an order to show cause why defendant Oh should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(m). There are no remaining claims against Defendant Marquez, and there is no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter a final judgment as to Defendant Marquez pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 54(b). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/21/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
November 2, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Appointment of Medical Expert for Physical Examination. It is not likely that yet another medical examination will provide additional information. To order a physical examination of a party is a discretionary decision of the Court. Plaintiff is indigent and cannot pay the required witness fees. Therefore, Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Medical Expert for Physical Examination is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/2/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desantiago v. Oh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwardo Desantiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oh
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Marquez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?