CollegeSource, Inc. v. Academyone, Inc.

Plaintiff: CollegeSource, Inc.
Defendant: Academyone, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01987
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2015 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 288 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The hearing set for December 11, 2015 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/8/15. (dlg)
September 24, 2015 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 251 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court Grants Defendant's motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court shall issue judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/24/2015. (srm)
August 12, 2015 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72 (Doc. 260 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/12/2015. (srm)
January 21, 2014 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 232 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay. The hearing set for January 24, 2014 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
April 15, 2013 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 204 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. The parties are directed to inform this Court within five (5) days of a ruling by the Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. The Court VACATES the hearing scheduled for April 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/2013. (srm)
March 29, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 167 , 173 Plaintiff's Motions to File Documents Under Seal (Per chambers: Sealed documents not filed pending Plaintiff's submission of redacted documents.). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/29/2013. (sjt)(jrd)
December 30, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 121 Motion to Stay; denying Plaintiff's 134 Ex Parte Motion (Application) to Enjoin Second-Filed Action Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/30/11. (cge)
August 24, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 08/24/09. (ag) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CollegeSource, Inc. v. Academyone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CollegeSource, Inc.
Represented By: Darren James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academyone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?