Garcia v. Yates

Petitioner: Raul Macias Garcia
Respondent: James A Yates
Case Number: 3:2008cv01993
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
January 13, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying respondent's 29 Motion to Dismiss, adopting 33 Report and Recommendation; Objections are overruled; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/12/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
October 12, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the Court issue an order approving and adopting this Report and Recommendation and denying Respondent's 29 Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's First Amended Petition for habeas corpus relief; Objections to R&R due 11/2/2010, Reply due 11/16/2010; Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/12/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj) (jrl).
August 26, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation, ORDER Denying Motion to Stay, and ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss: The Court overrules Petitioner's Objections to the R&R and adopts the R&R as modified herein. No later than 30 calendar days from the date this order is entered, Petitioner may file an amended petition containing only his exhausted claims. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/25/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (av1).
April 10, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that Respondent's 6 Motion to Dismiss be granted, Petitioner's 9 Motion to Stay and Abeyance be denied, the Petition be dismissed for failure to exhaust all claims presented and Petitioner be gran ted thirty days in which to file an amended petition containing only his exhausted claims. No later than May 1, 2009, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy to all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than May 22, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Macias Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James A Yates
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?