Cuero v. Adams et al

Petitioner: Michael Daniel Cuero
Respondent: Derral G Adams and James E. Tilton
Case Number: 3:2008cv02008
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Denies the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus for the reasons set forth in the Report & Recommendations. The Court issues a Certificate of Appealability as to all claims raised in the petition. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
April 25, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting 42 the Findings and Conclusions of United States Magistrate Judge;(2) Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and (3) Issuing a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/25/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
December 7, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Motion to Suppress Evidence for a Writ of Review and Sentence Modification 12 is denied without prejudice. (3) Respondent's motion for extension of time 25 is granted. Respondent shall file a response to the Petition on or before January 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/7/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuero v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Daniel Cuero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derral G Adams
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E. Tilton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?