Weeks v. Fresh-Pic Produce Company, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Alan Weeks and King Fresh Produce, LLC
Defendant: Fresh-Pic Produce Company, Inc., Frank Avila, Karina Saucedo and Clare Rubin
Case Number: 3:2008cv02058
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Agriculture Acts Office
County: Riverside
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 79 Motion to Amend or Withdraw their admissions; Granting in part and Denying in part 80 Motion to Amend or Alter the Judgment - Grants Defendants' motion to amend or alter the judgment (ECF No. 80 ) as to Mr. Almanza and Ms. Saucedo but Denies it as to Mr. Avila. The Court therefore orders that the judgment entered on 5/17/2012 (ECF No. 74 ) is hereby Vacated as to defendants Almanza and Saucedo but remains in full force and effect as to defendant Avila. The pretrial conference is set for 6/18/2013 at 2:00 PM, and the trial shall commence on 8/12/2013 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/12/2013. (rlu)
July 25, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Ex Parte 81 MOTION for Order Staying Execution of Judgment. The Court Orders that any amounts recovered by Plaintiffs on the 5/17/2012 judgment be placed on deposit in the registry of the Court, for the benefit of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/25/2012. (cc: Financial)(rlu)(jrd)
May 17, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Alan Weeks, an individual doing business as K&W Sales and against Defendants Frank Avila, Karina Saucedo, and Fresh-Pic Produce Company, Inc., join tly and severally, in the principal amount of $181,008.20. Judgment is also entered in favor of Plaintiff K&W Sales and against Defendant Michael A. Almanza (individually and doing business as Pura Vida) in the principal amount of $37,914 .80. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff King Fresh Produce, LLC, and against Defendants Frank Avila, Karina Saucedo, and Fresh-Pic Produce Company, Inc., jointly and severally, in the principal amount of $24,227.50. Judgment is also entered in favor of Plaintiffs Alan Weeks, an individual doing business as K&W Sales, and King Fresh Produce, LLC, against Defendants Fresh Cut Produce Company, a corporation, and Roberto Salinas. (ecs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weeks v. Fresh-Pic Produce Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Weeks
Represented By: Bart M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Fresh Produce, LLC
Represented By: Bart M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh-Pic Produce Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karina Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?