Carrillo v. Cate et al

Petitioner: Paul Carrillo
Respondent: Matthew Cate and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv02165
Filed: November 21, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Request for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/21/2009. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr)
August 17, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation and ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Petitioner's Objections are overruled. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/16/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (av1).
June 19, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that respondent's 4 MOTION to Dismiss Writ of Habeas Corpus be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/17/2009; reply to the objections shall be filed and served no later than ten days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S. Porter on 6/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?