Cendejas et al v. City of Imperial et al

Case Number: 3:2008cv02357
Filed: December 19, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion for Reconsideration; Granting Defendants' Request for Bifurcation; Denying Plaintiff's Request to Amend Pretrial Order to Include Ratification Theory of Liability; and Denying Defendants' Request for a Continuance of Trial. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/4/10. (jer)
September 28, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - REDACTED VERSION. Defendants' motion for summary judgment [Doc No. 60] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's motion for summary adjudication of liability [Doc. No. 80] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/14/2010.(jer)
August 2, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's 79 Second Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Plaintiff's Motion is Granted as to City RFP No. 43 as follows: Defendant's are ORDERED to produce documents responsive to RFP No. 43 only to the extent that su ch documents specifically relate to the use of a Taser when confronting a person with suspected "mixed martial arts training." Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED as to City of Imperial RFP No. 31, No. 32, No. 35, No. 37, and Interrogatory No . 14 and No. 15; Heredia RFP No. 1 and Interrogatory No. 1; and Valenzuela RFP No. 1 and Interrogatory No. 1. Defendants are ordered to disclose the documents specified in this Order, if any exist, within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order under the procedure applicable in this case pursuant to the protective order granted on July 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/30/2010. (jer)
July 12, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting New Trial Date and Continuing Pretrial Conference. The Jury Trial is reset for 10/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 9/14/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/12/10.(vet)
June 29, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 90 Motion to File Under Seal Doc. No. 86-1 and Plaintiff's Reply Re: Collateral Estoppel. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/29/10. (vet)
April 5, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Objections re 47 . Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Lewis's November 30, 2009 ruling are Overruled. The Court extends the discovery cut-off date to June 30, 2010 so that Plaintiff may complete discovery regarding the other Taser incidents. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/5/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cendejas et al v. City of Imperial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?