Ernest v. University of Phoenix et al

Case Number: 3:2008cv02363
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal to the Extent it is not Jurisdictionally Barred; granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for extension to file her notice of appeal to the extent it is not jurisdictionally barred, and GRANTS her motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Defendant may renew and raise its jurisdictional objections to the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/4/2010. (USCA Case Number 10-56537. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
March 18, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Plaintiff's ex parte application for leave to file Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/18/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
November 25, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Plaintiff may file an amended pleading curing the noted deficiencies on or before 01/04/2010. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/25/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernest v. University of Phoenix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?