Sullivan v. Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Sullivan
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation, Deutsche Bank Disability Plan and First Unum Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv02370
Filed: December 19, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 53 Ex Parte Motion to File Administrative Record Under Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/13/2010. (mjj)
August 31, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 43 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/31/2010. (mjj)
February 2, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Joint Motion for Discovery: Defendant shall produce the performance evaluations on or before February 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 2/2/2010. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sullivan
Represented By: John P Stennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Unum Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?