Burbridge v. Commissioner of Social Security et al

Plaintiff: Veronica Burbridge
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Doe's 1-5
Case Number: 3:2008cv02374
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion To Dismiss (Re Doc. 12 ): The court grants the motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/18/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (av1).
October 29, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting further briefing; scheduling order. The Commissioner is instructed to file a response to Plaintiff's opposition no later than November 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/29/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
July 2, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for time to effect service. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/2/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burbridge v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Burbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe's 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?