Cataulin et al v. Washington Mutual Bank, SFB et al

Plaintiff: Rosalito Vidal Cataulin and Virginia Delino Cataulin
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, SFB, Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 3:2008cv02419
Filed: December 30, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Plaza's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress against Plaza is dismissed. The court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Plaza. The court grants the Rule 58 motion for entry of judgment as to GMAC and MERS per 18 . Modified to edit text on 7/15/2009 (tkl).
July 13, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaza's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs' claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress against Plaza is dismissed. The court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Plaza. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to close the case file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/13/09. (tkl) (av1).
May 19, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for involuntary dismissal and for entry of judgment. Plaintiffs' submission must be filed and served by 6/2/09. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/19/09. (tkl) (jrl). Modified on 5/27/2009 to edit text (tkl).
March 9, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 and 5 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' fraud, RICO, cancellation, quiet title, and slander of title causes of action are dismissed as to GMAC Mortgage, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' causes of action for TILA and RESPA are dismissed with prejudice as to GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Plaintiffs' cause of action for negligent infliction of emotion al distress is dismissed without prejudice as to GMAC and MERS only. Plaintiffs shall file and serve an amended complaint within 20 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/9/09. (tkl) (jrl). Modified text on 4/8/2009 to reflect case dismissed as to GMAC Mortgage, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. only - per chambers (lao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cataulin et al v. Washington Mutual Bank, SFB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalito Vidal Cataulin
Represented By: David A St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Delino Cataulin
Represented By: David A St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, SFB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: John D Alessio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?