Barno v. Hernandez

Petitioner: Rodney Bernard Barno
Respondent: Robert J Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2008cv02439
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Motion For Reconsideration Of Order Rejecting Document; (2) Denying Motion For Leave To Conduct Discovery (Re Doc. 121 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/25/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
May 27, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 74 Motion to Prevent Transfer of Custody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc)
December 10, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to Petitioner's Notice of Dismissal (Doc. 55 ), the case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. Petitioner's Motion for Return of Lodged Exhibits (Doc. 49 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall send Petitioner a copy of his lodged exhibits. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/10/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; lodged exhibits (Doc. # 29-1) sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)
November 10, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Order (Doc. 52 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/10/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)(jrl).
August 26, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Re Doc. 32 ): The Court denies Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/25/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (av1).
August 10, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 22 ) is adopted in its entirety. The Motion to Stay (Doc. 2 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/10/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
April 20, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying Petitioner's Motion For Stay And Abeyance (Re Doc. 2 ): The Court recommends that Petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance be denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2009. Replies due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/17/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
March 17, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 13 ) is adopted, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 8 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/17/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)(jrl).
February 10, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying Petitioner's Motion For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction (Re Doc. 8 ): The Court recommends Petitioner's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2009. Replies due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/10/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barno v. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney Bernard Barno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert J Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?