Tenorio Plata et al v. Darbun Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Javier Tenorio Plata, Dolores Galvez Montes, Alfonso Victor Inclan Costa, German Vasquez Figueroa, Michell Arianne Curto Gongora, Carlos Acevedo Mendoza, Luis Delgado Picasso, Ruben Armand Robles Diaz, Graciela Herrera Rodriguez, Maria de los Angeles Sandoval, Reinaldo Rodriguez Velasquez, Braulio Alberto Delgado Brasia, Francisca Gastelum Aragon, Maria de la Villanet Sanchez Guzman, Yadira Cambreros Pineda, Daniel Orozco Valdez, Rebecca Gutierrez Juarez and Martha Huizar N.
Defendant: Darbun Enterprises, Inc., OEM Solutions, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00044
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement Office
County: XX Outside US
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER: (1) Granting Defendant's 122 Motion for Sanctions and Attorney's Fees; and (2) Granting 123 Defendant's Motion for Costs. Court imposes sanctions against Pla's counsel in the amount of $18,000. Plaintiff shall pay $416.74 for the costs of Defendant's deposition of Galvez. Payments shall be made by 9/1/2010, w/ proof of the payments to be filed by 9/3/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/13/10.(lao)
August 11, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 122 Motion for Sanctions and Attorney's Fees; granting Defendant's 131 Motion for Costs Under 28 USC Section 1919. Court imposes sanctions against Pla's counsel in the amount of $18,000. Plaintiff shall pay $416.74 for the costs of Defendant's deposition of Galvez. Payments shall be made by 9/1/2010, w/ proof of the payments to be filed by 9/3/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/11/2010. (jah)
May 6, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 100 Motion to Dismiss. Court sua sponte dismisses the action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss w/o prejudice is denied. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/6/2010. (jah)
September 23, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 18 Motion for Right to Attach Order; granting Plaintiffs' 20 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim; denying Defendant's 22 Motion for Costs Bond; denying Defendant's 23 Motion to Stay the Case. Plai ntiffs' motion to dismiss the fraud counterclaim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is denied and Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss both counterclaims for failure to state a claim pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) is granted. Dismissal of Darbun's counterclaim is w/o prejudice. Dft may file a Second Amended Counterclaim curing the deficiencies by 10/19/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/23/2009. (jah) (jrl).
April 9, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Darburn Enterprises, Inc's 6 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative 7 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 11 Ex Parte Application to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/9/09. (pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenorio Plata et al v. Darbun Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Tenorio Plata
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Galvez Montes
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Victor Inclan Costa
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Vasquez Figueroa
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michell Arianne Curto Gongora
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Acevedo Mendoza
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Delgado Picasso
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Armand Robles Diaz
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Herrera Rodriguez
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de los Angeles Sandoval
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinaldo Rodriguez Velasquez
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio Alberto Delgado Brasia
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Gastelum Aragon
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de la Villanet Sanchez Guzman
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Cambreros Pineda
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Orozco Valdez
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Gutierrez Juarez
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Huizar N.
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darbun Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OEM Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?