Center for Biological Diversity v. Kempthorne et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne and H. Dale Hall
Case Number: 3:2009cv00051
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting settlement and dismissing lawsuit with prejudice 23 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/17/09. (tkl)(av1).
August 24, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 joint Motion to Continue telephonic Case Management Conference for 30 days. Case Management Conference continued to 9/29/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 8/24/09. (tkl) (kaj).
June 30, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 joint Motion to Continue telephonic Case Management Conference to 8/27/09 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/30/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 24, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partially granting 12 joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference for thirty days. A telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference will be held on May 18, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. An in-person Settlement/Case Management Conference shall be held on June 15, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/24/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Kempthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: John Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Dale Hall
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?