Jason Wayne Clark v. Larry Small

Petitioner: Jason Wayne Clark
Respondent: Larry Small
Case Number: 3:2009cv00063
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Leave to Amend Petition; as to Clark's original four claims, the Court denies him a certificate of appealability; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/23/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
November 18, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Petitioner's Objections and Adopting 20 Report and Recommendation: Clark is ordered to show cause why leave to amend his Petition should be granted in this case. He must do so within 30 days of the date he receives this Order in the mail. The government may file a response within 14 days of the date Clark's pleading is filed. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
July 6, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied and Respondent's 15 Motion to Dismiss be denied as moot. No later than August 3, 2009, any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than 10 days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/2/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Wayne Clark v. Larry Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Wayne Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?