Chua v. America's Wholesale Lender

Plaintiff: Romero Chua
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Case Number: 3:2009cv00105
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Remand. This action is remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of San Diego pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(c)(3). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/17/10. (Certified copy of Order sent to Superior Ct)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
March 17, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend: If Plaintiff chooses to file a second amended complaint, he must file and serve it no later than April 6, 2010. Defendants shall file and serve any response to the second amended complaint within the time set in Rule 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/17/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (av1).
May 5, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 4 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss. Dft shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint w/in the time provided in Rule 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/5/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chua v. America's Wholesale Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romero Chua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Represented By: Martin T. McGuinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?