Lopez v. Giurbino et al

Plaintiff: Adam Ray Lopez
Defendant: G Giurbino, P Santoyo, M Levin, C Robertson and R Torchia
Case Number: 3:2009cv00108
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 176 Report and Recommendation; Granting In Part and Denying In Part 131 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying 186 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/11/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
November 7, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 115 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Permission to Submit Additional Interrogatory Questions; Granting 120 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendants are ordered to comply with the Court's Order by November 26, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/6/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)(jrd)
September 17, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting 48 Report and Recommendations; Granting 12 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Torchia; Denying 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 16 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Santoyo and Robertson; and Denying 28 Motion for Default Calling For Sanctions. For the reasons stated herein, and for the reasons expressed in the Report which are incorporated herein by reference, the Court overrules Plaintiff's Objection and Adopts the Report in its entirety, Grants-In-Part and Denies-In-Part Defendants Santoyo and Robertson's motion to dismiss, Grants Defendant Torchia's motion to dismiss, and Denies Plaintiff's Motion for Default Calling for Sanctions. The Court also denies Defendants' motion for an extension of time. Should Plaintiff desire to file a Second Amended Complaint, he must do so by 10/29/2010.Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/17/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Giurbino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ray Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Giurbino
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Santoyo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Levin
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Robertson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Torchia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?